MA S669 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H940
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require mental health parity for disability policies. Financial Services.
Title
Requiring mental health parity for disability policies
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] |
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Accompanied by H940 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H3926 (Similar To) 2023-11-03 - Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H940 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied S669
H940 (Replaces) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied S669
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S669 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S669.pdf |