MA S667 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2693

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to group insurance commission procurement. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to group insurance commission procurement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-14SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2693
2021-09-28JointHearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H2583 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S640 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2573 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1659 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1713 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1760 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S666 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S694 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S633 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2693 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback