MA S633 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to human donor milk coverage. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to human donor milk coverage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-09-30JointHearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1115 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H1116 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H1050 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H1715 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1110 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H909 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S577 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H988 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
S35 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S613 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H960 (Similar To) 2019-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H945 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H947 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback