MA S610 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2295
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase consumer transparency about insurance provider networks. Financial Services.
Title
To increase consumer transparency about insurance provider networks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2295 |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Read second |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, July 25, 2019 |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2295 |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2394 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2189 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H253 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Replaced by) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4018 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2019
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2189 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H253 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1472 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Replaced by) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4018 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2019
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S610 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S610.pdf |