MA S606 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2660

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote continuity of care for multiple sclerosis treatment. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting continuity of care for multiple sclerosis treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-27SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2660
2019-06-26JointHearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H730 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1311 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2696
H222 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S222 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
H1172 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S561 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H1751 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H112 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4485
H96 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
S838 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2447 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2660 (Replaced by) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback