MA S595 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-9)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the use of certain insurance underwriting guidelines for homeowners with dogs living on such insured property. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the use of certain insurance underwriting guidelines pertaining to dogs harbored upon the insured property

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-27SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-09-13JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H812 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2358
H1037 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S510 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2358
H2037 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4230
S2158 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1431 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2423
H3603 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2358
H3828 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2592
S2358 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2423 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback