MA S588 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S1148
Note: Legislation replaced by S2519

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to mental health parity implementation. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to mental health parity implementation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateAmendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted, as amended
2020-02-13SenateNew draft substituted, see S2519
2020-02-13SenateRead second
2020-02-06SenatePlaced in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 13, 2020
2020-02-06SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2020-02-06SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2519
2020-02-06SenateAccompanied by S1148
2019-12-02SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-09-19SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-05-30JointHearing rescheduled to 06/06/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in 222
2019-05-29JointHearing scheduled for 06/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H980 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
H908 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H1751 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1719 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
S550 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1163 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
S2276 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
S1148 (Replaces) 2019-12-02 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2519 (Replaced by) 2020-02-13 - Amendment #12 (Tran) rejected

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback