MA S572 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2543
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for coverage of necessary aqua therapy. Financial Services.
Title
Providing for coverage of necessary aqua therapy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2543 |
2019-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1115 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1050 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1715 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1110 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S577 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H988 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H968 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1568 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
H960 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H945 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2543 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1116 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1050 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1715 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1110 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S577 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H988 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H968 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1568 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S597 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S613 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - New draft substituted, see S2935
H960 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H945 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H947 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2340 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S2543 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S572 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S572.pdf |