MA S571 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to unfair and deceptive insurance practices. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to unfair and deceptive insurance practices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-28JointHearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H968 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1607 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S585 (Similar To) 2019-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S590 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/06/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in 222
S616 (Similar To) 2019-09-30 - Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1106 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S717 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback