MA S561 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to empower health care consumers. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Empowering health care consumers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-23SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S222 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2537
H79 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
H3388 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S599 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S687 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1151 (Similar To) 2019-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1108 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S665 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - House concurred
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S838 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S670 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1565 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback