MA S55 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to applied behavior analysis services. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to applied behavior analysis services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-09SenateBill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-08-26JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H1155 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H1879 (Similar To) 2019-11-22 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H87 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback