MA S540 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2729

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to empower towns and cities to protect residents and the environment from harmful pesticides. Environment and Natural Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Empowering towns and cities to protect residents and the environment from harmful pesticides

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-16SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2729
2024-04-08HouseHouse concurred
2024-03-18SenateReporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-04-28JointHearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources

Same As/Similar To

S2729 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H814 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4794
S2736 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2833 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback