MA S493 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to validate the actions taken at the 2020 Biennial State Election held in the city known as the town of Randolph. Election Laws. [Local approval received]
Title
Validating the actions taken at the 2020 Biennial State Election held in the city known as the town of Randolph
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 37 of the Acts of 2021 | |
2021-08-02 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-08-02 | House | Enacted |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2021-07-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-07-26 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2021-06-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-06-10 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Taken out of the Notice Section |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S2463 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S493 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S493.pdf |