MA S466 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5026
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the state primary to the second Tuesday of May. Election Laws.
Title
Establishing the state primary to the second Tuesday of May
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5026 |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H5026 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2515 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5353
H705 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
S1591 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2889
H2543 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5353
H2515 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5353
H705 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
S1591 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2889
H2543 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5353
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S466 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S466.pdf |