MA S422 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H3579

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to support working parents who choose to run for public office. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting parents running for public office

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-30SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2024-05-30SenateAccompanied by H669 and H3579
2024-03-04HouseHouse concurred
2024-02-29SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday May 28, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-05-11JointHearing scheduled for 05/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H669 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Accompanied S422
H3579 (Replaces) 2024-05-30 - Accompanied S422

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback