MA S422 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure a complete, accurate, and equitable census count. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure a complete, accurate, and equitable census count

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H1503 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1663 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2292 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1378 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S112 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S1342 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback