MA S414 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4780
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure quality of care in nursing homes. Elder Affairs.
Title
To ensure quality of care in nursing homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4780 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 16, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S671 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S189 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S320 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2492 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H4109 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Accompanied S2492
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S926 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S628 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1428 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
S416 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
S795 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1491 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3173
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
H4780 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S413 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
H733 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
H724 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
H727 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S189 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S320 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S2492 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H4109 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Accompanied S2492
S813 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S926 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S628 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1428 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
S416 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
S795 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1491 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3173
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1450 (Similar To) 2022-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2887
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
H4780 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S413 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
H733 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
H724 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
H727 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S414 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S414.pdf |