MA S396 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to election day registration. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to election day registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-06-11JointHearing scheduled for 06/20/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H558 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1332 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H656 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3128 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S2133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S406 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H244 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S1773 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H3135 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
S2298 (Similar To) 2019-08-28 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback