MA S373 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4320

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to automatically registering eligible voters and enhancing safeguards against fraud. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automatically registering eligible voters and enhancing safeguards against fraud

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4320
2017-05-25JointHearing scheduled for 06/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S370 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S100 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S503 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S71 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
S72 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
H2091 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H2092 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H353 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H4320 (Replaced by) 2018-06-27 - New draft substituted, see H4667
H4667 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Published as amended, see H4671
H4671 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - Reported by H4834
H4834 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 205 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback