MA S358 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Elder Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to home care. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to home care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Monday March 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-11JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H1598 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Committee recommended ought NOT to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H1674 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
S1063 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2311
H96 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S1702 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H1692 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S986 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback