MA S350 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2749

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to expand dual enrollment for high school students in Gateway Cities. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To expand dual enrollment for high school students in Gateway Cities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-10SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2749
2021-06-07JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S287 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H574 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
H512 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5004
H1361 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
S1495 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4819
S346 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1661 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2749 (Replaced by) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback