MA S316 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2385

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote alternative dispute resolution for students. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote alternative dispute resolution for students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2385
2017-06-22JointHearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S219 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S697 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S230 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
S231 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
S263 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S1332 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1256 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S1374 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S239 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S1524 (Similar To) 2017-05-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S112 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
H2233 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H2232 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3934
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H228 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H41 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2266 (Similar To) 2018-04-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2385 (Replaced by) 2018-04-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback