MA S3135 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-03 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-03 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Lisa Balentine, an employee of the Department of Transitional Assistance. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Lisa Balentine, an employee of the Department of Transitional Assistance
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Timilty [D] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D] | Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2022-11-02 | House | House concurred |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-10-27 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S1068 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1164 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1023 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
H217 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S108 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S141 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H279 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S1883 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1164 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1023 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
H217 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S108 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S141 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H279 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4909
S1883 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3135 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3135.pdf |