MA S3110 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S3109
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on August 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Michael Zaniewski, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 3110).
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Michael Zaniewski, an employee of the Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2022-08-29 | Senate | New draft of S3109 |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S3109 (Replaces) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3110
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2090 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1772 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4619
S2309 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2809
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
H54 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2021
H58 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2090 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1772 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4619
S2309 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2809
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
H54 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2021
H58 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3110 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3110.pdf |