MA S3109 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3110
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3110
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3110
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Michael Zaniewski, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Michael Zaniewski, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S3110 |
2022-08-25 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2090 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1772 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4619
S2309 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2809
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S3110 (Replaced by) 2022-08-29 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
H54 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2021
H58 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S2090 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1772 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4619
S2309 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2809
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S3110 (Replaced by) 2022-08-29 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
H54 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2021
H58 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3109 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3109.pdf |