MA S3098 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Bernardston to continue the employment of fire department member Lloyd Grover. Public Service. [Local approval received]
Title
Authorizing the town of Bernardston to continue the employment of fire department member Lloyd Grover
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S3111 |
2022-08-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/15/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-08-08 | House | House concurred |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1192 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S3111 (Replaced by) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2022
H1950 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
H1984 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1164
S1188 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1192 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S3111 (Replaced by) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 240 of the Acts of 2022
H1950 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
H1984 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1164
S1188 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3098 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3098.pdf |