MA S3071 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-25 - Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-25 - Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to police cadets in the city of Everett. Public Service. [Local approval received]
Title
Relative to police cadets in the city of Everett
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-08-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/05/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-07-29 | House | House concurred |
2022-07-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H775 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H187 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2669 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2608
H4223 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2022
H1483 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied S1047
S41 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2021
H3707 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Accompanied S41
S2983 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - New draft (DiDomenico) substituted, see S3175
H187 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2669 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2608
H4223 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2022
H1483 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied S1047
S41 (Similar To) 2021-05-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2021
H3707 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Accompanied S41
S2983 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - New draft (DiDomenico) substituted, see S3175
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3071 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3071.pdf |