MA S3054 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-26 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-26 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Deborah Grimm, an employee of the Department of Children and Families. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Deborah Grimm, an employee of the Department of Children and Families
Sponsors
Sen. John Velis [D] | Rep. Daniel Carey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-26 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Billreported favorably by committee |
2022-07-25 | House | House concurred |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S1761 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S2961 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2966
H4094 (Similar To) 2021-11-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2021
H4103 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2021
S2966 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H5230 (Similar To) 2022-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 250 of the Acts of 2022
S1708 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S6 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S1761 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S2961 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2966
H4094 (Similar To) 2021-11-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 89 of the Acts of 2021
H4103 (Similar To) 2021-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2021
S2966 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H5230 (Similar To) 2022-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 250 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3054 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3054.pdf |