MA S3027 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5442
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-27 - Amended by substitution of a new draft, see H5442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-27 - Amended by substitution of a new draft, see H5442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Marblehead to amend the general bylaws to add a new chapter 175, Elections regarding the order of candidates names on ballot. Election Laws. [Local approval received]
Title
Authorizing the town of Marblehead to amend the general bylaws to add a new chapter 175, Elections regarding the order of candidates names on ballot
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | House | Amended by substitution of a new draft, see H5442 |
2022-12-27 | House | Read third |
2022-09-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-09-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-09-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-07-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-21 | House | House concurred |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S485 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S448 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S457 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S476 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H5442 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
S448 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S2288 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S457 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
S476 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H5442 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3027 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3027.pdf |