MA S3026 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Hinsdale to continue employment of Susan Rathbun. Public Service. [Local approval received]
Title
Authorizing the town of Hinsdale to continue employment of Susan Rathbun
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Hinds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-15 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-07-21 | House | House concurred |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1192 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H5149 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Pocket veto
H3864 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2022
H4451 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4452 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2841 (Similar To) 2022-07-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2022
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1192 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
H5149 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Pocket veto
H3864 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2022
H4451 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4452 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2841 (Similar To) 2022-07-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3026 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3026.pdf |