MA S3010 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Wareham Redevelopment Authority. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]
Title
Relative to the Wareham Redevelopment Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-08-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/05/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-07-19 | House | House concurred |
2022-07-18 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S238 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S2562 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 435 of the Acts of 2022
S2501 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - New draft substituted, see S2587
S2504 (Similar To) 2022-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2505 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3720 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H5080
H4772 (Similar To) 2022-12-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 297 of the Acts of 2022
H5080 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 313 of the Acts of 2022
S2562 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 435 of the Acts of 2022
S2501 (Similar To) 2021-11-24 - New draft substituted, see S2587
S2504 (Similar To) 2022-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2505 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3720 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H5080
H4772 (Similar To) 2022-12-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 297 of the Acts of 2022
H5080 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 313 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3010 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3010.pdf |