MA S3000 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2925
Note: Legislation replaced by S3172
Note: Legislation replaced by S3172
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-29 - Reprinted, as amended, see S3172
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-29 - Reprinted, as amended, see S3172
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize raising the maximum retirement age of special police officers in the town of Charlton to 70 years old, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 3000).
Title
Authorizing raising the maximum retirement age of special police officers in the town of Charlton to 70 years old
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Public Service | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] | Sen. Peter Durant [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-29 | Senate | Reprinted, as amended, see S3172 |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Read third |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Amendment (Fattman) adopted |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Read second |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-07-14 | Senate | New draft of S2925 |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2925 (Replaces) 2022-07-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3000
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1750 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2736 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2714 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2021
S1618 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1369 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2589
S3172 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S295 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1750 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2736 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2714 (Similar To) 2021-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2021
S1618 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1369 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2589
S3172 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3000 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3000.pdf |