MA S2983 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 293 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 293 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the renaming of the board of selectmen to select board in the town of Hubbardston
Title
Providing for the renaming of the board of selectmen to select board in the town of Hubbardston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 293 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-01-05 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-12-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-12-23 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Substituted for S2919 |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Gobi) for S2919 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2983 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2983.pdf |