MA S2979 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-10-2)
Status: Passed on January 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 337 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-10-2)
Status: Passed on January 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 337 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to sexual violence on higher education campuses (being the text of Senate, No. 2978, printed as amended). January 5, 2021.
Title
Relative to sexual violence on higher education campuses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 337 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Enacted |
2021-01-05 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House still further amendment |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-01-05 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment with a further amendment |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-01-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-05 | House | Read second, amended by substitution of a new text (H5241) and ordered to a third reading |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment (H5241) pending |
2021-01-05 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-12-21 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Text of S2978, printed as amended |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2979 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2979.pdf |