MA S2972 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3131
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-31 - New draft substituted, see S3131
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 30 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-31 - New draft substituted, see S3131
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the select board of Easton to lease certain parcels of land. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]
Title
Authorizing the select board of Easton to lease certain parcels of land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-31 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S3131 |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Read second |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-07-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-07-05 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S2440 (Similar To) 2022-11-21 - Joint session held and dissolved
S3053 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2022
S3131 (Replaced by) 2022-11-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 278 of the Acts of 2022
S3147 (Similar To) 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 355 of the Acts of 2022
H2166 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S2440 (Similar To) 2022-11-21 - Joint session held and dissolved
S3053 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2022
S3131 (Replaced by) 2022-11-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 278 of the Acts of 2022
S3147 (Similar To) 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 355 of the Acts of 2022
H2166 (Similar To) 2021-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2021
S1354 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2778
S2482 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2799
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2972 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2972.pdf |