MA S2945 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3113
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - New draft (Rausch) substituted, see S3113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-06 - New draft (Rausch) substituted, see S3113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to a town center wastewater service area for the town of Norfolk. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]
Title
Relative to a town center wastewater service area for the town of Norfolk
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | Senate | New draft (Rausch) substituted, see S3113 |
2022-09-06 | Senate | Read second |
2022-09-06 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-07-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-06-23 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1361 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2451
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
S145 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S2990 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2022
S3053 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2022
S3113 (Replaced by) 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 354 of the Acts of 2022
S3147 (Similar To) 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 355 of the Acts of 2022
H885 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3444 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H2160 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2451 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2875
S2464 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2021
S145 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2550 (Similar To) 2022-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2021
S2990 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 111 of the Acts of 2022
S3053 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 170 of the Acts of 2022
S3113 (Replaced by) 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 354 of the Acts of 2022
S3147 (Similar To) 2023-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 355 of the Acts of 2022
H885 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3444 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H2160 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2945 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2945.pdf |