MA S2938 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S3116
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - New draft (Comerford) substituted, see S3116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - New draft (Comerford) substituted, see S3116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Northfield to establish the Grandin Water District. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]
Title
Authorizing the town of Northfield to establish the Grandin Water District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | Senate | New draft (Comerford) substituted, see S3116 |
2022-09-08 | Senate | Read second |
2022-07-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-07-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-06-21 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S565 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S403 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S3116 (Replaced by) 2022-11-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 257 of the Acts of 2022
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S565 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S403 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S3116 (Replaced by) 2022-11-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 257 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2938 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2938.pdf |