MA S2931 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring safe patient access to emergency care
Title
Ensuring safe patient access to emergency care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-07 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Enacted |
2021-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-01-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-05 | House | Read second, amended by substitution of a new text (H5246) and ordered to a third reading |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment (H5246) pending |
2021-01-05 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-10-26 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S2767 |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2767 |
2020-10-22 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2931 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2931.pdf |