MA S2920 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-25 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-25 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to special police officers in the city known as the town of Randolph. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to special police officers in the city known as the town of Randolph
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Electronic Hearing |
2020-10-13 | House | House concurred |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2920 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2920.pdf |