MA S2919 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2983
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-22 - New Draft substituted, see S2983
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-22 - New Draft substituted, see S2983
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for the renaming of the Board of Selectmen to Select Board in the town of Hubbardston. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for the renaming of the Board of Selectmen to Select Board in the town of Hubbardston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | Senate | New Draft substituted, see S2983 |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Read third |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-11-02 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-11-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-11-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2020-10-08 | House | House concurred |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2983 (Replaced by) 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 293 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2919 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2919.pdf |