MA S2870 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the Baker Hill Road District. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Baker Hill Road District

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-11 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2020
2020-08-06SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2020-08-06HouseEnacted
2020-08-06SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2020-08-06HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2020-08-06HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-08-03HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-08-03HouseRules suspended
2020-08-03HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2020-08-03HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2020-07-31SenateRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2020-07-31SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2020-07-31SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-07-31SenateRules suspended
2020-07-31SenateBill reported favorably by committee
2020-07-30HouseHouse concurred
2020-07-27SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
2020-07-27SenateRules suspended
2020-07-24SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback