MA S2867 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 195 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Sharon L. Kelley, an employee of the trial court of the Commonwealth. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Sharon L. Kelley, an employee of the trial court of the commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-23 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 195 of the Acts of 2020
2020-10-19SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2020-10-19HouseEnacted
2020-10-19SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2020-10-19HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2020-10-15HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-09-03HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-09-03HouseRules suspended
2020-09-03HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2020-08-31HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2020-08-27SenateRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2020-08-27SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2020-08-10SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-08-10SenateRules suspended
2020-08-10SenateBill reported favorably by committee
2020-07-30HouseHouse concurred
2020-07-28SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary
2020-07-28SenateRules suspended
2020-07-24SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback