MA S2837 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2929
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2929
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2929
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the city known as the town of Randolph to grant additional liquor licenses. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city known as the town of Randolph to grant additional liquor licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-22 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2929 |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2020-08-17 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 08/10/2020 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-08-17 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 08/24/2020 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-08-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/10/2020 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-07-24 | House | House concurred |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2929 (Replaced by) 2020-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 243 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2837 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2837.pdf |