MA S2814 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2899
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2899
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2899
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to respond to the COVID-19 emergency by instituting a moratorium of the Massachusetts Comprehensive Assessment System. Education.
Title
Responding to the COVID-19 emergency by instituting a moratorium of the Massachusetts Comprehensive Assessment System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2899 |
2020-08-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/10/2020 from 12:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-07-13 | House | House concurred |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2899 (Replaced by) 2020-08-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2814 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2814.pdf |