MA S2812 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To expand take-out/delivery options in response to COVID-19
Title
To expand take-out/delivery options in response to COVID-19
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-07-16 | House | Enacted |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-07-16 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-07-16 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-16 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading, with the amendment pending |
2020-07-16 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2020-07-16 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text contained in House document numbered 4856 |
2020-07-13 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Substituted as a new draft for S2740 |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2740 |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2812 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2812.pdf |