MA S2810 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-9-1)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to make the Secretary of Veterans Services a cabinet level position. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the secretary of veterans’ services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-22 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-08-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday October 16, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-08-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/12/2020 from 04:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-07-09 | House | House concurred |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2810 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2810.pdf |