MA S2803 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 437 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 437 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Brookline to establish a means-tested senior citizen property tax exemption. Revenue. [Local approval received]
Title
Authorizing the town of Brookline to establish a means-tested senior citizen property tax exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 437 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-12-29 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-12-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-12-04 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-04-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/15/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-04-07 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1860 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1845 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1843 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S1937 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
H4755 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 333 of the Acts of 2022
H5063 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1860 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1845 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1843 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S1937 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
H4755 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 333 of the Acts of 2022
H5063 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2803 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2803.pdf |