MA S2802 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - See H4555
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - See H4555
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Site Information & Links
Title
Site Information & Links
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | See H4555 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Substituted as a new text for H4555 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Recommended new text for H4555 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2249 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied H3379
H3379 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft substituted, see H4555
H4555 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2022
H3379 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft substituted, see H4555
H4555 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2802 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2802.pdf |