MA S2784 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2625
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to court officers injured on duty, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2784).
Title
Relative to court officers injured on duty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-03-24 | Senate | New draft of S2625 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2625 (Replaces) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2784
S1719 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied H2732
S1191 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2817
S1107 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1714 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2768 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1719 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied H2732
S1191 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2817
S1107 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S927 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1714 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2768 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2784 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2784.pdf |