MA S2770 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the lease of the former Lee Pool Complex located in the city of Boston. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the lease of the former Lee Pool Complex located in the city of Boston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Report amended by substitution of bill |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under JR10) |
2020-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2020-06-18 | House | House concurred |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2770 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2770.pdf |